FL H0449 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes circuit courts to create early childhood court programs; requires early childhood court programs have certain components; provides requirements & guidelines for OSCA when hiring community coordinators & statewide training specialist; authorizes Trial Court Budget Commission to provide funding to circuit courts that choose to establish coordination system in lieu of creating community coordinator position; requires DCF to contract with certain university-based centers; requires university-based centers to hire clinical director.
Title
Early Childhood Courts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-10-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S236 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1324 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1105
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-138
S1324 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1105
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-138
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/449 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/449/BillText/Filed/PDF |