FL H0451 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOH to develop & publish on its website educational pamphlet regarding use of nonopioid alternatives for treatment of pain; provides requirements for health care practitioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonopioid Alternatives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#170 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-30SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 630
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 1
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseAmendment(s) adopted (099799, 879149)
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-03-27HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
2019-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-15HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-03-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-14HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-08HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-07HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-05HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S630 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 451

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/Amendment/839551/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/Amendment/099799/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/Amendment/869113/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/Amendment/879149/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/Vote/HouseVote_h00451c2170.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/451/Vote/SenateVote_h00451e1007.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback