FL H0453 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definitions of "correctional officer" & "law enforcement officer" to include persons employed part time; specifies allegation of misconduct may originate from any source.
Title
Law Enforcement and Correctional Officers
Sponsors
House Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee | Rep. Wyman Duggan [R] | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS referred to Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-10-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |