FL H0455 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits sale, transfers, or possession of assault weapon or large-capacity ammunition magazine; provides exceptions; requires certificates of possession for assault weapons or large-capacity ammunition magazines lawfully possessed before specified date; provides conditions for continued possession of such weapons or large-capacity ammunition magazines; requires certificates of transfer for transfers of assault weapons or large-capacity magazines; provides for relinquishment of assault weapons or large-capacity magazines; provides requirements for transportation of assault weapons; provides enhanced criminal penalties for certain offenses when committed with assault weapon or large-capacity magazine.
Title
Assault Weapons and Large-Capacity Magazines
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Smith [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Javier Fernandez [D] |
Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Joy Goff-Marcil [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
Rep. Cindy Polo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S466 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H553 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S500 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
H553 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S500 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/455 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/455/BillText/Filed/PDF |