FL H0463 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Criminal Justice Standards & Training Commission to include implicit bias training in instruction dealing with diverse populations; requires SBE to develop requirements for training for all K-12 instructional personnel & administrators in recognizing & overcoming implicit bias; requesting Supreme Court develop training requirements for judges on implicit bias.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implicit Bias Training

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-12HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction
2019-12-12HouseWithdrawn from Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-11-07HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-10-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S942 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9431716Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback