FL H0467 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the powers and duties of the Board of Physical Therapy Practice; requiring the board to establish minimum standards of practice for the performance of dry needling, and additional supervision and training requirements for the performance of dry needling of specified areas, by physical therapists, etc.
Title
Physical Therapy Practice
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | Rep. Cyndi Stevenson [R] | Rep. Juan Fernandez-Barquin [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#590 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#590 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-128 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-10 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 792 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (721931) |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-02-11 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-21 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, Mashburn Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S792 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 467
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
486 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |