FL H0473 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs AHCA to establish statewide, centralized registry of persons who have symptoms associated with ST-elevation myocardial infarctions; requires certain health care facilities to report specified data to registry; requires AHCA to contract with entity to maintain registry; authorizes limited disclosure of records of emergency calls containing certain patient information; requires specified entities to share information relating to transport of certain patients.
Title
STEMI Registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S260 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 8175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/473 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/473/BillText/Filed/PDF |