FL H0481 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishes Columbia County Law Library; transfers library's assets & liabilities to Columbia County.
Title
Columbia County Law Library
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#728 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#728 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Chapter No. 2016-245 | |
2016-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 03/08/16 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2016-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-12-03 | House | Favorable by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 12/03/15, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-11-18 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-11-18 | House | Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 11/18/15, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-10-29 | House | Filed |