FL H0485 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-15)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that sexual orientation & gender identity are impermissible grounds for discrimination in public lodging establishments & public food service establishments; revises provisions of Florida Civil Rights Act of 1992 & Fair Housing Act to include sexual orientation & gender identity; provides exception for constitutionally protected free exercise of religion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited Discrimination

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S430 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S438 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1279 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
419001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76060Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback