FL H0491 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DEA to develop & implement public education program relating to screening for Alzheimer's disease within existing resources of department; provides criteria for awarding grants; provides that implementation of memory-impairment screening grant program is contingent upon appropriation of state funds or availability of private resources; specifies types of facilities where employee or direct caregiver providing care for persons with Alzheimer's disease may begin employment without repeating certain training requirements, etc.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 47 | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to HHS Access Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 47 | |
2011-01-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0586 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 1755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 6045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 178 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/491 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0491/BillText/Filed/HTML |