FL H0497 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Film, Television, & Digital Media Targeted Rebate Program within DEO; provides eligibility requirements & application procedures; requires Commissioner of Film & Entertainment to review applications & take certain actions; requires annual report to Governor & Legislature; provides for expiration of program & reversion of appropriated funds.
Title
Entertainment Industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-10-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S530 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/497 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/497/BillText/Filed/PDF |