FL H0503 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Physician Fee Sharing Task Force within DOH; provides for duties, membership, & meetings of task force; requires report to Governor & Legislature by specified date; provides for expiration of task force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthcare Innovation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4560541Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback