FL H0505 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & provides requirements for dealer & fleet license plates & specialty license plates; revises & provides requirements for presale, establishment, issuance, fee distribution, & use of fees for certain specialty license plates; requires certain organizations to establish endowments for providing scholarships to Florida residents & provide documentation of consent to use certain images; directs DHSMV to establish pilot project for issuing optional electronic credentials; provides procurement & transaction requirements; requires report to Governor & Legislature; provides that presenting electronic device displaying electronic credential does not constitute consent for law enforcement officer to access other information on device; provides for liability.
Title
Transportation Credentials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#234 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-25 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (129653, 600199) 830 |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) failed (814423) 822 |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | CS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19 |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-18 | House | CS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 3 |
2019-04-16 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/18/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-29 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-02-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-02-13 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H199 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H201 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H273 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H275 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S480 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S482 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S484 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S486 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1104 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
S1106 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H1053 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S620 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-144
H201 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H273 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H275 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S480 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S482 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S484 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S486 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1104 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
S1106 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H1053 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S620 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-144
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |