FL H0519 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revising notice of claim requirements for property owners; authorizing property owners to bring claims against governmental entities in certain circumstances; providing that property owners are not required to submit formal development applications or proceed through formal application processes to bring claims in specified circumstances; authorizing property owners to bring actions to declare prohibited exactions invalid; requiring the Department of Transportation to afford a right of first refusal to the previous property owner before disposing of property in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Growth Management
Sponsors
House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. James Grant [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] | Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] |
Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#579 (Y: 83 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 83 NAYS 36 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (041923) 841 |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 5 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 8 |
2020-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 01/30/20, 11:30 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-17 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-16 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-11-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1766 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S7054 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S410 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor
S7054 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S410 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
337 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |