FL H0525 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-206, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 523 (Ch. 2014-205)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-206, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 523 (Ch. 2014-205)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for certain personal identifying information held by tax collector when individual applies for license to carry concealed weapon or firearm pursuant to s. 790.06, F.S.; provides for retroactive application of exemption; provides for disclosure of such information under specified conditions; provides for legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity; provides for contingent effect.
Title
Pub. Rec./Personal Identifying Information/Licensure to Carry Concealed Weapon or Firearm
Sponsors
House Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee | Rep. James Grant [R] | Sen. Greg Steube [R] | Sen. Ben Albritton [R] |
Sen. Dennis Baxley [R] | Rep. Richard Corcoran [R] | Rep. Travis Cummings [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#578 (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#578 (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-206, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 523 (Ch. 2014-205) | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-25 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2014-04-25 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 546 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 4 |
2014-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/09/14 |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-20 | House | Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/20/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-05 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-02-25 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2014-02-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-02-18 | House | CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2 |
2014-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 02/18/14, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0523 (Related) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-205, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 525 (Ch. 2014-206)
S0546 (Similar To) 2014-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 525 (Ch. 2014-206), CS/CS/HB 523 (Ch. 2014-205)
S0544 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 523 (Ch. 2014-205), CS/HB 525 (Ch. 2014-206)
S0546 (Similar To) 2014-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 525 (Ch. 2014-206), CS/CS/HB 523 (Ch. 2014-205)
S0544 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 523 (Ch. 2014-205), CS/HB 525 (Ch. 2014-206)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 0601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |