FL H0527 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires county or municipality enacting ordinance relating to animal control or cruelty to impose specified surcharge on civil penalty for violations of ordinance; specifies use of proceeds of surcharge to subsidize costs of spaying or neutering of dogs and cats whose owners voluntarily submit their animals for sterilization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Control or Cruelty Ordinances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 54
2011-11-04 Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 54
2011-11-01 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82827Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback