FL H0527 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 280 (Ch. 2017-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 280 (Ch. 2017-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires jury's recommendation of sentence of death to be unanimous; requires jury to recommend life imprisonment without possibility of parole if jury does not unanimously recommend sentence of death.
Title
Sentencing for Capital Felonies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 280 (Ch. 2017-1) |
2017-03-10 | House | Substituted SB 280 |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 |
2017-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/21/17, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-15 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/15/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0280 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - Chapter No. 2017-1
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/527 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0527/BillText/Filed/PDF |