FL H0541 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises statute of limitations periods for prosecution of certain sexual offenses; specifies that period for prosecution of certain sexual offenses may not begin until results of specified testing have been received; requires FDLE to create & maintain database for tracking sexual offense evidence & ensure that alleged sexual assault victims & certain other persons are notified of & have access to information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-15HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-11-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H199 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-81
S170 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 199
S892 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
H727 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1028 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943326Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback