FL H0543 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removing a provision that requires a joint committee to determine standards for the content of advanced registered nurse practitioner protocols; removing an obsolete qualification that is no longer sufficient to satisfy certain nursing certification requirements; requiring an advanced registered nurse practitioner to enter into a supervisory protocol with a physician under certain circumstances; authorizing the board to conduct certain onsite evaluations; requiring the Florida Center for Nursing to evaluate program-specific data for each approved nursing program and make an annual assessment of compliance by nursing programs with certain accreditation requirements; authorizing a pharmacist to administer specified medication by injection under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of Health Care Practitioners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#440 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#46 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#245 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26 Chapter No. 2017-134
2017-06-23 Approved by Governor
2017-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-05HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2017-05-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 1
2017-05-05HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (323602) 1151
2017-05-05HouseIn returning messages
2017-05-04SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) adopted (323602)
2017-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-03SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 328
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-03SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Rules
2017-05-01SenateReceived
2017-04-30SenateReferred to Health Policy; Rules
2017-04-26SenateIn Messages
2017-04-26HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2017-04-26HouseRead 3rd time 872
2017-04-25HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (208377, 356095, 442471, 505601) 831
2017-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-03HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2017-04-03HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-23HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2017-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/23/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-03-14HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2017-03-14HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2017-03-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-03-07HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-28HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-02-23HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-02-22HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-02-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-01-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0328 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 543 (Ch. 2017-134)
H7011 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 229 (Ch. 2017-41), CS/CS/HB 543 (Ch. 2017-134)
S1074 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181), CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164), HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)
H229 (Similar To) 2017-05-31 - Chapter No. 2017-41
S876 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 229 (Ch. 2017-41)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3844018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560635Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458348Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651893Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46880Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0543/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0543/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0543/Amendment/315165/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/Amendment/356095/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/Amendment/208377/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/Amendment/442471/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/Amendment/505601/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/Vote/HouseVote_h00543e1245.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/Vote/SenateVote_h00543e1046.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/543/Vote/HouseVote_h00543e1440.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback