FL H0565 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-7-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expands exception to eligibility requirement for expunction of criminal history record to allow prior expunction of criminal history record granted for offense committed when person was minor; provides exception.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expunction of Criminal History Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-05HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-04HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-03HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-15HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-11-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S684 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430585Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback