FL H0573 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain persons who participate in peer support communication with a first responder from testifying or divulging specified information under certain circumstances; specifying that an allegation or complaint of misconduct against a law enforcement officer or a correctional officer may originate from any source; authorizing law enforcement and correctional agencies to request a separate agency to conduct an investigation of a complaint under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
First Responders and Correctional Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#750 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#648 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#648 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chapter No. 2020-104 | |
2020-06-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2020-03-12 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (910716) |
2020-03-12 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-12 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 733 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (910716) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 160 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-03-10 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-10 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (877421) |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-12 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Favorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-02 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-30 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-11-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S160 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 573
H453 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S884 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H453 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S884 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
111 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |