FL H0585 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes state agency to enter into pay-for-success contract with private entity under certain conditions, subject to appropriation & specified language in GAA; authorizes carryforward of specified unexpended appropriations; provides contract requirements; authorizes cancellation of contract; specifies services & programs that may be eligible for funding under contract; prohibits private entity from viewing or receiving personal client information that is otherwise confidential & exempt from public records law; requires agency to provide annual report to legislative appropriations committees by specified date; requires DMS to prescribe certain procedures by specified date.
Title
Pay-for-success Contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-11-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1182 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/585 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/585/BillText/Filed/PDF |