FL H0595 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits arrest or penalty under specified provisions of person seeking medical assistance for individual experiencing alcohol-related or drug-related overdose or for himself or herself; prohibits this protection from being grounds for suppression of evidence in other prosecutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol or Drug Overdose Prosecutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#141 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-24SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 450
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateSubstituted for SB 530
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-24SenateWithdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-25HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-03-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-21HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/21/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-14HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-14HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2019-03-14HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-12HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S530 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 595
S1334 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
562112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89321Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback