FL H0595 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employers from taking adverse personnel action against employees or applicants who are qualified patients using medical marijuana; requires employers to provide certain written notice to employees or applicants who test positive for marijuana; provides procedures for if employee or applicant tests positive for marijuana; provides cause of action & damages.
Title
Medical Marijuana Employee Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-11-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S962 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
448 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/595 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/595/BillText/Filed/PDF |