FL H0597 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that name & identity of birth parent, adoptive parent, & adoptee may be disclosed from adoption records without court order under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#81 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-21HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/21/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-14HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-14HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-14HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-12HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S832 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
382015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63162Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback