FL H0605 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reclassifies criminal offense relating to donation of human tissue; deems certain actions unlawful if person acts with intent to transmit specified disease; requires person who commits offense involving transmission of specified bodily fluids to undergo HIV testing; permits, rather than requires, infected arrestee to request treatment for sexually transmissible disease; requires DOH to pay costs for screening; eliminates certain crimes related to prostitution; revises focus of section from testing of alleged perpetrators to medical treatment & care of victims who are at risk of HIV infection resulting from sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transmission of Disease Through Bodily Fluids

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2017-02-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0628 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38423Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38434Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750877Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
960003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback