FL H0605 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 952 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 952 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that participation in Senior Management Service Class of FRS is compulsory for certain persons on specified date; authorizes members of such class to purchase & upgrade certain retirement credit; provides appropriation.
Title
Senior Management Service Class
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 952 passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to- Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Original reference(s) removed: State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/18/20, 11:30 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S952 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-120