FL H0609 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 702 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 702 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes use of Inland Protection Trust Fund for activities related to petroleum storage system removal & replacement & certain damages; requires assessment reports & Petroleum Cleanup Participation Program agreements to include cost savings; removes certain requirements for copayments; requires advanced cleanup applications to include certain agreements; requires contractors to submit scopes of work for certain assessments; directs DEP to issue certain purchase orders; specifies strict liability exceptions for certain causes of action.
Title
Environmental Contamination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 702 passed |
2020-02-24 | House | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-20 | House | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/20/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S702 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-56
S1350 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1001 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1350 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1001 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
376 | 3071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 30713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |