FL H0613 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes repeal of s. 7, Art. VI of State Constitution to eliminate requirement for public financing of campaigns of candidates for elective statewide office who agree to campaign spending limits.
Title
Repeal of Public Campaign Financing Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 6 |
2019-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-29 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 6 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-13 | House | Now in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 5 |
2019-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H615 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
S270 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S272 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
S270 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S272 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/613 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/613/BillText/Filed/PDF |