FL H0615 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that certain health care providers & vendors who primarily serve clients with specified conditions may be considered agents & employees of state or its subdivisions with respect to such services while acting within scope of & pursuant to guidelines established in contractual agreement or Medicaid provider agreement; requires indemnification; provides construction of provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sovereign Immunity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 54
2011-02-16 Referred to HHS Access Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 55
2011-02-04 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0966 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458320Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
616242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624461Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback