FL H0615 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 887 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition of term "manufacturer" to include persons that provide for use or lease of cigarette manufacturing machines at retail establishments, effective on certain date; authorizes credit for sale of tobacco products to be extended to retail dealer under specified conditions; provides for suspension of sale of tobacco products to retail dealers delinquent in their credit payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale of Tobacco Products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 887 (Ch.
2012-02-17 Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 682
2012-02-16 CS/CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time -HJ 660
2012-02-16 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2012-02-15 CS/CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 -HJ 670
2012-02-13 On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 02/15/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB
2012-02-06 Now in Finance and Tax Committee -HJ 525
2012-02-06 Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
2012-02-03 CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 463
2012-02-03 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2012-01-31 CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 467
2012-01-27 On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 61
2011-11-21 Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 61
2011-11-09 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
210181Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback