FL H0615 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Statewide K-12 Education Commission within DOE to streamline & improve state's education system; provides membership & duties; requires annual report with recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide K-12 Education Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied in K-12 Subcommittee
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-02-12HouseReferred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2013-02-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0992 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback