FL H0615 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates "Florida Student Intern Employment Program"; provides tax credit against corporate income tax for hiring student interns; provides qualifying criteria for business & student intern; provides limitations & requirements with respect to program; provides that tax credit is equal to specified percentage of wages paid to student intern, subject to cap on total amount of credit claimable by business; authorizes DOR to adopt rules; authorizes business to carry forward unused tax credit for specified number of years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment of Student Interns

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-01-27HouseReferred to Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2014-01-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1608 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220198Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback