FL H0615 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that parenting plan that provides for shared parental responsibility over health care decisions must authorize either parent to consent to mental health treatment for child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parenting Plans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
2016-02-03HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-02-03HouseNow in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
2016-02-02HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2016-02-01HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2016-01-28HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/01/16, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2015-11-17HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0794 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
S0012 (Similar To) 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-241, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 373 (Ch. 2016-80), CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2016-127), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6113Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback