FL H0615 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-135
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Occupational Opportunity Act; revises length of time active duty servicemember may remain in good standing with administrative board or program; requires that spouse or surviving spouse be kept in good standing & be exempt from licensure renewal provisions; requires DBPR to issue professional license to spouse or surviving spouse of active duty member; provides requirements related to application, fees, & renewal; provides for fee waiver for specified persons; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#185 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26 Chapter No. 2017-135
2017-06-23 Approved by Governor
2017-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-04-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-04-27SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2017-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1272
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Regulated Industries; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations
2017-04-25SenateReceived
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations
2017-04-25SenateIn Messages
2017-04-20HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-19HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-19HouseAmendment(s) adopted (737769)
2017-04-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
2017-04-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-06HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0
2017-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
2017-03-27HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2017-03-23HouseCS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-23HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-21HouseCS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-03-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-03-10HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-03-10HouseCS referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-03-10HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2017-03-08HouseCS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-07HouseCS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 03/07/17, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-02-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1272 (Same As) 2017-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 615 (Ch. 2017-135)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
455219Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback