FL H0615 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to Florida Election Campaign Financing Act; deletes provisions governing public funding of campaigns for candidates for statewide office who agree to certain expenditure limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-04HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 7
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-29HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 6
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-13HouseNow in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2019-03-13HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 5
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-31HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H613 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S272 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
S270 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S892 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
H1009 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-90

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
106021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10630Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10631Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10632Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10633Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10634Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10635Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106353Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10636Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32872Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071622Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback