FL H0615 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1292 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes requirement that limits diversion program expunction to programs for misdemeanor offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Diversion Program Expunction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseLaid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1292 passed
2020-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-02-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-28HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-01-28HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 4:30 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-16HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S700 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
S1292 (Similar To) 2020-06-27 - Vetoed by Governor
H1173 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1292 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430582Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985126Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback