FL H0617 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises circumstances under which insurers issuing homeowners' insurance policies must include a specified statement relating to flood insurance with policy documents at initial issuance & renewals.
Title
Homeowners' Insurance Policy Disclosures
Sponsors
House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Wengay Newton [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Fentrice Driskell [D] |
Rep. Dianne Hart [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#180 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#180 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Chapter No. 2019-82 | |
2019-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 380 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-26 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-08 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-07 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-07 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:15 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S380 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 617 (Ch. 2019-82)
S550 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 617 (Ch. 2019-82)
S550 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 617 (Ch. 2019-82)