FL H0631 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for storage of firearms; provides criminal penalties if minor access stored firearm & uses it in specified ways; revises definition of "minor"; requires seller or transferor of firearm to provide specified information; provides immunity for certain providers of information; revises standard for adults & minors to be criminally negligent in storage of firearms in certain circumstances.
Title
Sale, Transfer, or Storage of Firearms
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] | Rep. Melony Bell [R] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Cindy Polo [D] |
Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S266 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
784 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/631 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/631/BillText/Filed/PDF |