FL H0641 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Chapter No. 2020-94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Chapter No. 2020-94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the annual allocation to school districts to include an additional calculation of full-time equivalent membership for students who earn a College Board Advanced Placement Capstone Diploma beginning in a specified fiscal year; creating the teacher salary increase allocation; prohibiting a school district or charter school from reducing the base minimum salary; deleting the Florida Best and Brightest Allocation, etc.
Title
Funds for the Operation of Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#765 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#589 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#589 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Chapter No. 2020-94 | |
2020-06-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-13 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-13 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (183008) 1227 |
2020-03-13 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted (183008) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, withdrawn (679870) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (183008) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Temporarily postponed |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted for SB 836 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (175779) |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/29/20, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-23 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Favorable by Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/23/20, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S836 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 641
S62 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H187 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H7067 (Similar To) 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H5101 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7079 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S440 (Similar To) 2019-10-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S486 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
S62 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H187 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H7067 (Similar To) 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H5101 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7079 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S440 (Similar To) 2019-10-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S486 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |