FL H0651 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that certain utilities are not exempt from providing medically essential electric service; provides notification requirements for electric utilities relating to certification process for obtaining medically essential electric service & service disconnection; specifies duties of electric utilities; revises penalties for falsification of such certification; requires certain health care practitioners to inform certain patients of such certification process; requires such practitioners to provide patients with completed medical certifications & document certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medically Essential Electric Utility Service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#71 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-25HouseCS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2019-03-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-21HouseCS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-14HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-21HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-20HouseFavorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1370 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45645Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback