FL H0673 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises membership of Florida Life & Health Insurance Guaranty Association's board; specifies requirements relating to director of Florida Health Maintenance Organization Consumer Assistance Plan to be confirmed to association's board; specifies duties of association as to potential long-term care insurer impairments or insolvencies, sharing information, & providing assistance to plan's board; requires that DFS, rather than receivership court, approve certain alternative policies or contracts; authorizes association's board to file directly for actuarially justified rate or premium increases; specifies calculation & allocation of Class B assessments for long-term care insurance; specifies limit on certain assessments on member insurer or member HMO.
Title
Insurer Guaranty Associations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#198 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#198 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Chapter No. 2019-83 | |
2019-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 626 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-08 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-04 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 2 |
2019-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-25 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/25/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-12 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | CS referred to Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-11 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-07 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 5 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:15 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S626 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 673 (Ch. 2019-83)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
631 | 713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 717 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 718 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 721 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 738 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 820 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |