FL H0683 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises locations where licensee is prohibited from openly carrying handgun or carrying concealed weapon or firearm.
Title
Prohibited Places For Weapons and Firearms
Sponsors
Rep. James Bush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S364 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/683 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/683/BillText/Filed/PDF |