FL H0687 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes community pharmacy to use automated pharmacy system; provides that certain drugs stored in such system for outpatient dispensing are part of inventory of pharmacy providing services through such system; requires Board of Pharmacy to adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automated Pharmacy Systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#218 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HousePassed; YEAS 109 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-13HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-12HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1170 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H1115 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4650235Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback