FL H0693 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Florida Seal of Biliteracy Program; provides program purpose; provides for administration of program & award of Gold Seal of Biliteracy or Silver Seal of Biliteracy; prohibits DOE & school districts from charging fee for seals; provides for rulemaking.
Title
Florida Seal of Biliteracy Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237) |
2016-01-25 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-22 | House | CS by K-12 Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-20 | House | CS by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 01/20/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2015-11-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0898 (Same As) 2016-01-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S0890 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7021 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
S0890 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7021 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 432 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |