FL H0693 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions related to registrations & renewals of communications service providers; specifies limitations on municipal & county authority to regulate & manage municipal & county roads or rights-of-way; prohibits municipalities & counties from electing to impose permit fees; prohibits municipalities & counties from actions relating to aerial or underground communications facilities; prohibits authorities from actions relating to registrations, applications, permits, & approvals in small wireless facilities; authorizes civil action for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communications Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseLaid on Table
2019-04-26HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-22HouseCS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2019-04-19HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-18HouseCS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 1
2019-04-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/18/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall
2019-04-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/10/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall -- Temporarily postponed
2019-04-03HouseCS/CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time
2019-04-03HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-04-02HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-02HouseCS/CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 04/02/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-25HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-03-25HouseCS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1000 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337401Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback