FL H0693 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that certain students be ineligible for state financial aid; provides that certain individuals may not be denied classification as residents for purposes of receiving state financial aid awards based on his or her immigration status if certain criteria are met.
Title
Student Eligibility Requirements for State Financial Aid Awards and Tuition Assistance Grants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-11-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S188 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1009 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/693 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/693/BillText/Filed/PDF |