FL H0697 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for relief of Donald Brown by District School Board of Sumter County; provides for appropriation to compensate Donald Brown for injuries sustained as result of negligence of employee of DSBSC; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs. CLAIM:
Title
Relief/Donald Brown/District School Board of Sumter County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#116 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1150 (Y: 111 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1092 (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1150 (Y: 111 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1092 (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1713 | |
2012-03-09 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 4 -SJ 1405 | |
2012-03-09 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (951941) -SJ 1405 | |
2012-03-08 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 8 -HJ 1186 | |
2012-03-08 | Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (951941) -HJ 1186 | |
2012-03-07 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 6 -SJ 951 | |
2012-03-07 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 951 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Rules -SJ 845 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 106 NAYS 7 -HJ 1096 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1095 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1058 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 834 | |
2012-02-24 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3 -HJ 834 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/24/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-20 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 676 | |
2012-02-20 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-17 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 -HJ 685 | |
2012-02-15 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/17/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 68 | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 68 | |
2011-11-16 | Filed |