FL H0701 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that e-mail addresses & Internet identifiers of sexual predators or sexual offenders reported pursuant to specified laws be exempt from public record requirements unless otherwise ordered by court; provides for future review & repeal of exemption; provides public necessity statement.
Title
Pub. Rec./Internet Identifiers of Sexual Predators or Offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-10 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-03-09 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-08 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0699 (Related) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-170
S0686 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
S0684 (Similar To) 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
S0686 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
S0684 (Similar To) 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/701 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0701/BillText/Filed/PDF |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/701/BillText/c1/PDF |