FL H0701 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Healthy Florida Trust Fund within OIR; provides for purpose of trust fund & source of funds; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of trust fund.
Title
Trust Funds/Creation/Healthy Florida Trust Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H697 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
S1486 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S1486 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/701 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/701/BillText/Filed/PDF |